Market announcement
Järvevana
Category
Other price sensitive information
Attachments
Date
15.12.2009 16:05:00
Title
A comment regarding Harju County Court's press secretary Kristina Ots's statement „The court will not comment utter lies“
Message
This announcement is issued to comply with NASDAQ OMX Tallinn stock exchange's „Requirements for Issuers“ (valid since 18.08.2008) item 2.2.1. On December 10 2009 AS Järvevana issued a stock exchange announcement „Overview of the land-swapping case“ http://www.nasdaqomxbaltic.com/market/?pg=details&instrument=EE3100003559&list=3 &tab=news&news_id=238437 in which it informed investors of proceedings in the land-swapping case, as the proceedings will now break for a longer holiday until January 12 2010. On December 11 2009 Delfi internet portal published a story „The court will not comment utter lies“ http://www.delfi.ee/news/paevauudised/eesti/absoluutset-valet-kohus-ei-kommentee ri.d?id=27504323, where Harju County Court's press secretary Kristina Ots states as if AS Järvevana had published erroneous fact in its 10.12 announcement. AS Järvevana assumes Harju County Court's press secretary Kristina Ots had previously familiarised herself with AS Järvevana's announcement on 10.12.2009 and can specify which specific incorrect statements have been made by AS Järvevana in the announcement. We again confirm that directives of the Chairman of the Harju County Court granting judges powers to issue surveillance permits submitted to the counsel of AS Järvevana do not contain any references to the numbers or to dates of the previous directives, but simply indicate an identical date and registration number, i.e. are missing the first essential component of documents in the form of the date of its initial production and signing. The granting of powers to judge Eda Murak to issue surveillance permissions from 05.01.2009 can be viewed from enclosed file. AS Järvevana stands by its question in the previous stock exchange announcement: when and why was judge Eda Murak given permission to issue such permits from 05.01.2009 onwards, i.e. when she was already retired and as her retirement was known already in the autumn of 2008. AS Järvevana Teet Roopalu Member of the Supervisory Board